Colman, Rebecca Eve (CPSO#: 88784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
11 PMB
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5112
Fax: (416) 340-3609
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

180 Bedford Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2K9
Canada
Phone: 4169299946
Fax: 4169635703
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

123 Edward Street Suite 1011
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416 813-2277
Fax: 416 260-3203
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA EVE COLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012