Colton, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 70322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sherbourne St., #408
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: 647-349-8311
Fax: 450-924-2423
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St.
7 Eaton South, Room 409
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416-340-4229
Fax: 416-340-3430
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Centre for Addiction and Mental
Health
Room 533
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 979-6932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colton and Kurdyak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kurdyak ( CPSO# 71392 )
Dr. P. Colton ( CPSO# 70322 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
33 Russell Street
Room T305
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
408 - 600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (647) 349-8311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE COLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004