Cooper, Curtis Lindsay (CPSO#: 73576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room-G12
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 72296
Fax: (613) 737-8164
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.L. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cooper ( CPSO# 73576 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room-G12
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CURTIS LINDSAY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1999