Cooper, Michael James (CPSO#: 82797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 45007
Fax: 9055752696
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nelson ( CPSO# 91926 )
Dr. M. Cooper ( CPSO# 82797 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010