Cooper, Scott Alexander (CPSO#: 67017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2009


Corporation Name: S. A. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cooper ( CPSO# 67017 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 16 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 16 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 16, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Scott Alexander
            Cooper,  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cooper to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SCOTT ALEXANDER COOPER
                                          ("Dr. Cooper")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Cooper, certificate of registration number 67017, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  professional conduct.

            (3)   I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215165 (the "Investigation") into my conduct in the
                  workplace.

            (4)   I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that I do not currently have any hospital
                  privileges.

            (5)   I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date"), and terminating upon the expiry of the obligations
                  set out at paragraphs (7) and (8) below which, at the latest, will be
                  four (4) years from the Effective Date ("Termination Date").

            (7)   Reports from Chief(s) of Department

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake that, in the event that I obtain
                        privileges and/or commence practice at any hospital within two
                        years of the Effective Date, the Chief(s) of my department at each
                        and every location that I practise or have privileges (the
                        "Chief(s) of Department") will be required to execute an
                        undertaking in the form attached hereto as Appendix "A".  I
                        acknowledge that I have reviewed the undertaking at Appendix "A"
                        and understand what is required of the Chief(s) of Department which
                        includes, without limiting the generality of the foregoing:
                  
                        (i)   written reports to the College every three months for a
                              period of two (2) years;
                  
                        (ii)  such reports to include information regarding my behaviour,
                              conduct, communications and professionalism, including
                              information provided to the Chief of Department by nursing
                              and/or medical staff working directly with me; and 
                  
                        (iii) immediate reporting to the College if he or she has any
                              concerns about my conduct, behavior or professionalism,
                              including whether it is impacting on patient care, or that I
                              am not in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date that I obtain privileges and/or commence
                        practice at any hospital.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake that if any person who has given an
                        undertaking in  Appendix "A" to this undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
            (8)   Reports from Chief(s) of Staff

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake that, in the event that I obtain
                        privileges and/or commence practice at any hospital or facility
                        within two years of the Effective Date, the Chief(s) of Staff
                        (which includes the Medical Director/Lead Physician with oversight
                        responsibilities of a facility) at each and every location that I
                        practise or have privileges (the "Chief(s) of Staff") will be
                        required to execute an undertaking in the form attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B".  I acknowledge that I have reviewed the undertaking
                        at Appendix "B" and understand what is required of the Chief(s) of
                        Staff which includes, without limiting the generality of the
                        foregoing:
                  
                        (i)   written reports to the College every three months for a
                              period of two (2) years;
                  
                        (ii)  such reports to include information regarding my behaviour,
                              conduct, communications and professionalism, including
                              information provided to the Chief of Staff by nursing and/or
                              medical staff working directly with me; and
                  
                        (iii) immediate reporting to the College if he or she has any
                              concerns about my conduct, behavior or professionalism,
                              including whether it is impacting on patient care, or that I
                              am not in compliance with my Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date that I obtain privileges and/or commence
                        practice at any hospital.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake that if any person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, for two (2)
                        years from the Effective Date, I further undertake to inform the
                        College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days
                        of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cooper, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Cooper, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Department, Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location.

            (14)  I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Cooper, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Cooper's
                              professional conduct.  As a result of the investigation, for
                              two (2) years the Chief(s) of Department and Chief(s) of
                              Staff of each and any location where Dr. Cooper has
                              privileges shall provide written reports to the College every
                              three (3) months regarding Dr. Cooper's behaviour, conduct,
                              communications and professionalism.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Cooper, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Department, Chiefs of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location, with any information the
                  College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this
                  Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Scott Alexander Cooper to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2018.

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Cooper's professional conduct. As a result of the investigation, for two (2) years the Chief(s) of Department and Chief(s) of Staff of each and any location where Dr. Cooper has privileges shall provide written reports to the College every three (3) months regarding Dr. Cooper's behaviour, conduct, communications and professionalism.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)