Cordovani, Daniel (CPSO#: 93332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia HSC 2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75171
Fax: (905) 523-1224
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Cordovani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cordovani ( CPSO# 94650 )
Dr. D. Cordovani ( CPSO# 93332 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Suite HSC-2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3rd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Daniel Cordovani may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. Cordovani holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Cordovani  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Cordovani's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Cordovani's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2013, and expires on June 30, 2019.
                  Upon   renewal  of  Dr.  Cordovani's  academic  appointment  at  McMaster
                  University,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.