Courchesne, Mathieu (CPSO#: 89488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
361 Main Street East
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1A8
Phone: (613) 632-0605
Fax: (613) 632-7073
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Canada
Phone: (613) 632-1111
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHIEU COURCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURCHESNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010