Cowan, Hamish Jonathan (CPSO#: 93815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hamish Cowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Cowan ( CPSO# 93815 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMISH JONATHAN COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015