Cowger, Jeffery John Michael (CPSO#: 95642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone: (519) 873-1447
Fax: 5198731448
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cowger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cowger ( CPSO# 95642 )

Business Address:
Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
204 - 230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 873-1447

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY JOHN MICHAEL COWGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016