Creaser, Kimberley Jane (CPSO#: 82740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carlton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: 6137212000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberley Creaser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Creaser ( CPSO# 82740 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Business Address:
Qikiqtani General Hospital
P.O Box 100
Station 1036 Iqaluit
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Phone Number: (867) 979-7334

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 14 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLEY JANE CREASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CREASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2008