Creek, Kristen Lee Breanne (CPSO#: 93612)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen Creek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: East Liberty Medical Centre 901 King Street West Toronto ON M5V 3H5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016


Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 / 1-888-781-9083 ext. 120 Fax: 1-888-297-9338
Date Received: 07 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2016