Cregan, Timothy Ryan (CPSO#: 72597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
760 Eagleson Road
Kanata ON  K2M 0A7
Phone: (613) 592-9081
Fax: (613) 592-6554
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy R. Cregan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cregan ( CPSO# 72597 )

Business Address:
760 Eagleson Road
Kanata ON  K2M 0A7
Phone Number: (613) 592-9081

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY RYAN CREGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CREGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000