Croke, Jennifer Michelle (CPSO#: 88676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Medicine Program
7-215-700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-4483
Fax: (416) 946-8111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Croke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Croke ( CPSO# 88676 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
7-215-700 University Avenue
Radiation Medicine Program
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 946-4483

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE CROKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015