Curran, Sean Patrick (CPSO#: 72387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44621
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2200 Eglington Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-3946
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Curran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Curran ( CPSO# 72387 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN PATRICK CURRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003