Curran-Sills, Gwynn Martin (CPSO#: 94601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (403) 943-9300
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Calgary Health Centre
31 Sunpark Plaza Southeast
Calgary AB  T2X 3W5
Canada
Phone: (403) 943-9300
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GWYNN MARTIN CURRAN-SILLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURRAN-SILLS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 22 Nov 2010 to 21 Dec 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2017