Cusimano, Michael David (CPSO#: 56052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6048
Fax: (416) 864-5857
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael D. Cusimano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cusimano ( CPSO# 56052 )
Dr. M. Cusimano ( CPSO# 103140)

Business Address:
University Health Network - TWH
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6048

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID CUSIMANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUSIMANO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985