Czarnecka-Kujawa, Katarzyna (CPSO#: 86819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
9N 941
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 4657
Fax: (416) 340-4556
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katarzyna Czarnecka-Kujawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Czarnecka-Kujawa ( CPSO# 86819 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Room 9N 941
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 02 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATARZYNA CZARNECKA-KUJAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZARNECKA-KUJAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012