Czilli, Tiffany (CPSO#: 95814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3691 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1H8
Phone: (519) 944-4449
Fax: (519) 948-0338
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Czilli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Czilli ( CPSO# 95814 )

Business Address:
3691 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1H8
Phone Number: (519) 944-4449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIFFANY CZILLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZILLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 05 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014