Czok, Anna Aleksandra (CPSO#: 64424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
624 - 115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Czok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Czok ( CPSO# 64424 )

Business Address:
312 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 741-0921

Business Address:
Suite 624
115 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone Number: (416) 741-0921

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ALEKSANDRA CZOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2000