D'Cunha Rebello, Chrysal Dorothy Emiliana (CPSO#: 78929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: D'Cunha, Chrysal Dorothy Emiliana (used until: 28 Sep 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Ross University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3C3
Phone: (416) 265-6663
Fax: (416) 265-1263
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Cunha Rebello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Cunha Rebello ( CPSO# 78929 )

Business Address:
205 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 265-6663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRYSAL DOROTHY EMILIANA D'CUNHA REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'CUNHA REBELLO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2003 to 04 May 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2003 to 14 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2004 to 25 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006