D'Souza, Rohan Dominic (CPSO#: 96310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  14 Sep 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Topiwala National Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
OPG Building
Room 3-908
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5127
Fax: (416) 586-8649
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'souza ( CPSO# 96310 )

Business Address:
University of Toronto
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
3rd Floor, Suite 3-908
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rohan Dominic D'Souza may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        D'Souza holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. D'Souza  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. D'Souza's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. D'Souza's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 15, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 14, 2021.