DaCambra, Mark Philip (CPSO#: 79405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Specialty Clinic- 5D187
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0S2
Phone: (613) 945-1551
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DaCambra Martin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 11 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK PHILIP DACAMBRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DACAMBRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013