Dagnone, Robert Vico (CPSO#: 84412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
E1 112
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33200
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.V. Dagnone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dagnone ( CPSO# 84412 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
Room E1-112
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT VICO DAGNONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAGNONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011