Daigneault, Emilie (CPSO#: 91250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Medicale Asclepios
Unit 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0Z9
Phone: (613) 830-8388
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emilie Daigneault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Daigneault ( CPSO# 91250 )

Business Address:
Clinique Medicale Asclepios
2 - 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
110 Rossignol Drive
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N2
Phone Number: (613) 451-1414

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILIE DAIGNEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAIGNEAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011