Dang, Karen (CPSO#: 75046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital - WOHS
Hospitalist Program
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32163
Fax: (416) 747-3611
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital - WOHS
Hospitalist Program
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57337
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Dang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dang ( CPSO# 75046 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002