Dao, Viet Cuong (CPSO#: 91036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Poly Clinic
Unit 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

208-4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Canada
Phone: 4165460848
Fax: 4165461858
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dao ( CPSO# 91036 )

Business Address:
Toronto Poly Clinic
204-5460 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Business Address:
Suite 208
4125 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1E 2S2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jun 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. Viet Cuong Dao (November 1, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Dao’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Dao engaged in the sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct through acts including but not limited to: making inappropriate and/or sexual comments to Patient A and making inappropriate and/or sexual comments to Patient A while rubbing/massaging her.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As from June 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Viet Cuong Dao in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dao to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. VIET CUONG DAO
                                          ("Dr. Dao")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Effective Date" means the date this Undertaking is accepted by the ICR
                  Committee.
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Dao, certificate of registration number 91036, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that the College received information and
                  initiated an investigation into whether I failed to maintain the standard
                  of practice of the profession in my prescribing of controlled substances,
                  including narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking as
                  signed by me is accepted by the ICR Committee, the College will also
                  deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking as
                  of the Effective Date.

            (6)   I, Dr. Dao, shall keep a Log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                  (i)   the date of the appointment;
                  (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number, if applicable;
                  (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction, number of
                        tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                  (iv)  the clinical indication;
                  (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or increased
                        dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the patient (Y/N); 
                  (vi)  Dr. Dao's signature;
                  (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review (if applicable, as
                        set out below); and
                  (viii)the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s signature (if applicable, as set out
                        below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for a minimum of twelve (12) months on the terms
                        set out below (the "Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge and undertake that each phase of Clinical
                        Supervision set out below will only be reduced upon recommendation
                        of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval by the College.
                  
            Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 1")

                  (c)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to engage in Phase 1 of Clinical Supervision
                        for a minimum of eight (8) weeks on the terms set out below.
                  
                  (d)   During Phase 1, I, Dr. Dao, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every week to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                  
                        i.    20 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 20 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs , then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s)'s prior review; and
                  
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                              prior review.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that during Phase 1, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every two (2) weeks.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that after a minimum of eight (8) weeks of
                        Phase 1, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced. 
                  
            Phase 2 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 2")

                  (h)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Dao, undertake to engage in Phase 2 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of eight (8) weeks on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (i)   During Phase 2, I, Dr. Dao, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every two (2) weeks to discuss the
                        Clinical Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s)'s prior review; and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                              prior review. 
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (k)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that during Phase 2, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every four (4) weeks.
                  
                  (l)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that after a minimum of eight (8) weeks of
                        Phase 2, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice in a less
                        highly supervised environment, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        recommend to the College that supervision be reduced.
                  
            Phase 3 of Clinical Supervision ("Phase 3")

                  (m)   Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and approval
                        by the College, I, Dr. Dao, undertake to engage in Phase 3 of
                        Clinical Supervision for a minimum of eight (8) months on the terms
                        set out below.
                  
                  (n)   During Phase 3, I, Dr. Dao, undertake to meet with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) at least once every month to discuss the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s review of:
                        i.    15 charts for patients to whom I have prescribed Narcotic
                              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                              Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior
                              review, or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review
                              there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to
                              whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                              Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, then the charts of
                              all patients listed in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s)'s prior review; and
                        ii.   At least 10 charts of patients to whom I have initiated a new
                              prescription for:
                              1.    Narcotic Drugs, or
                              2.    Narcotic Preparations; or
                              3.    Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                    Substances and All other Monitored Drugs where the
                                    patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                                    Narcotic Preparation,
                              or if since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review there
                              are not 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom I
                              have initiated a new prescription for Narcotic Drugs,
                              Narcotic Preparations or Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                              and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                              where the patient is also prescribed a Narcotic Drug and/or
                              Narcotic Preparation, then the charts of all patients listed
                              in the Prescribing Log since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                              prior review. 
                  
                  (o)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) must sign and date the Prescribing Log to confirm the
                        charts that the Clinical Supervisor(s) has reviewed and discussed
                        with me.
                  
                  (p)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that during Phase 3, the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will provide a report to the College at least once
                        every month.
                  
                  (q)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that after a minimum of eight (8) months of
                        Phase 3, if the Clinical Supervisor(s) is satisfied that I have the
                        necessary knowledge, skills and judgment to practice without
                        supervision, the Clinical Supervisor(s) may recommend to the
                        College that the Clinical Supervision cease. 
                  
                  (r)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge and undertake that the Clinical Supervision
                        will only cease upon recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        and approval by the College.
                  
                  (s)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  In
                        addition to what is set out above, the Clinical Supervisor(s) will,
                        at a minimum: 
                  
                        i.    Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        ii.   Discuss any concerns with me arising from chart reviews and
                              observations;
                  
                        iii.  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; and
                  
                        iv.   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision.
                  
                  (t)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake that all meetings with my Clinical
                        Supervisor(s) will take place at my Practice Location, or another
                        Location approved by the College;
                  
                  (u)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that all charts reviewed shall be
                        independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the
                        educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to
                        my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report of the medical inspector received October 10, 2017, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (v)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        reasonable recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including
                        but not limited to, any reasonable recommended practice
                        improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (w)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (x)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within fourteen (14)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (y)   I, Dr. Dao, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the terms set out in sections (8)(w) and/or (x)
                        above, I will cease prescribing Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                        Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                        Substances and All other Monitored Drugs until such time as I have
                        obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (z)   I, Dr. Dao, agree that if I am required to cease prescribing
                        Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs as a result of section (8)(y) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                        registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the Public Register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   In the course of this investigation, I, Dr. Dao, voluntarily
                        enrolled in the University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program
                        in Safe Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                        workshop):  www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        i.    University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        ii.   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Medical
                              Record-Keeping:  http://www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/;
                  
                        iii.  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                  
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
                  
                              3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                    https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
                  
                              4.    The Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp
                  
                        iv.   Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the CPSO
                              Policy "Medical Records":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
                              and 
                  
                        v.    any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of each element of the Professional Education
                        specified above, including proof of registration, attendance and
                        participant assessment reports where available, within one (1)
                        month of completion of each element, or as completed previously. I
                        acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole
                        discretion, whether I have successfully completed each element of
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        Clinical Supervision set out under section 8 of the Undertaking has
                        ceased, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Reassessment").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may include
                        a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview of me,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        Location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that Location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of
                  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation
                  of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with the section above, the following summary
                        shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information about Dr. Dao's prescribing of
                        controlled substances, including narcotics, and conducted an
                        investigation.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Dao's prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic
                                    preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and
                                    other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs
                                    will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable
                                    to the College for minimum of twelve (12) months. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Dao will engage in professional education in the
                                    prescribing of controlled substances, including
                                    narcotics.
                  
                              *     Following the professional education and period of
                                    supervision, Dr. Dao's prescribing of controlled
                                    substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by
                                    an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s
                        undertaking set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (2of 2)
            As from November 30, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Viet Cuong Dao, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dao to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. VIET CUONG DAO
                                          ("Dr. Dao")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Dao, certificate of registration number 91036, am a member of the
                  College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, in the matter of College File Number 104197, allegations that
                  I engaged in professional misconduct. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Dao, have read the Notice of Hearing dated November 1, 2017 which
                  sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking in
                  lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake that I shall not engage in any professional
                        encounters, in person or otherwise ("Professional Encounter(s)"),
                        with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the
                        Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and
                        under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated
                        health professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice
                        Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                        Undertaking are fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I
                        must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during
                        any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian
                        of the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and understand what is
                        required of the Practice Monitor including, but not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters with all patients; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Professional Encounters with
                              patients, including but not limited to physical and internal
                              examinations.  I further acknowledge my obligation to ensure
                              the Practice Monitor's view of all of my Professional
                              Encounters with patients, including physical and internal
                              examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing me in all my Professional
                              Encounters with patients; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with
                              patients in the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix
                              "B" (the "Log");
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to maintain an up to date copy of the Log, by
                        ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and to
                        make it available to the College upon request. 
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                        sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms,
                        in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                        location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states: "Dr. Dao
                        has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or
                        otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                        presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                        Dr. Dao must not be alone during any professional encounter with
                        any patient. Further information may be found on the College
                        website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to providing
                        services in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).
                  
            (11)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, undertake to ensure that each patient with whom I have
                        a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the
                        Professional Encounter, that I have agreed not to have professional
                        encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age,
                        unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable
                        to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.
                  
                  (b)   With respect to patients with whom I have appointments that are
                        scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance, I, Dr. Dao, undertake
                        to ensure that each patient is directly notified, within seven (7)
                        days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details of the
                        restriction described in section (11)(a), above.
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any chief(s) of staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Dao is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a
                              result of the referral:
                  
                  
                              Dr. Dao must not engage in any professional encounters, in
                              person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any
                              jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                              continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                              professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other
                              requirements provided in Dr. Dao's Undertaking with the
                              College are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr. Dao must not
                              be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.
                  
                              Dr. Dao shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination
                              rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a
                              clearly visible and secure location, that states: "Dr. Dao
                              has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or
                              otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous
                              presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of
                              Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Dr. Dao must not be
                              alone with any patient during any professional encounter.
                              Further information may be found on the College website at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Dao, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (22)  I, Dr. Dao, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records by the College
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (24)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Practice Monitor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (26)  I, Dr. Dao, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Viet Cuong Dao to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2018:

The College received information about Dr. Dao’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, and conducted an investigation. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Dao’s prescribing of narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, and other monitored drugs will be supervised by a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for minimum of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Dao will engage in professional education in the prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics.

Following the professional education and period of supervision, Dr. Dao’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.


Source: Member
Active Date: November 30, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Viet Cuong Dao to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 30, 2017:

Dr. Dao is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct. As a result of the referral:


Dr. Dao must not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the continuous presence of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College, and unless the other requirements provided in Dr. Dao’s Undertaking with the College are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Dao must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter.

Dr. Dao shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, that states: “Dr. Dao has agreed not to have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Dao must not be alone with any patient during any professional encounter. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.