Davis, Amie Jeanette (CPSO#: 82685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone: (905) 333-8222
Fax: (905) 333-9343
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Maternity Centre of Hamilton
100 Main Streeet West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-5553
Fax: (905) 528-9178
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amie Davis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Davis ( CPSO# 82685 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-4941

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
103-1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 870-2207

Business Address:
100 Main Street
2nd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 528-5553

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIE JEANETTE DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009