Davison, Patrick John (CPSO#: 72704)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of General Surgery
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street - 4th floor
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-8345
Fax: (613) 345-8318
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davison & Hobden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hobden ( CPSO# 71492 )
Dr. P. Davison ( CPSO# 72704 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
4th Floor
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-8345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN DAVISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003