De Ruiter, Joost Matthys (CPSO#: 72857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cambridge, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5224
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ellis-De Ruiter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ellis ( CPSO# 85103 )
Dr. J. De Ruiter ( CPSO# 72857 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
2211 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOOST MATTHYS DE RUITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE RUITER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 19 Oct 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2007