DePiero, Steven Adair (CPSO#: 71239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3C 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dental Office of Dr. Joe Philip
18 Wyandotte St,
Orillia ON  L3V 6H2
Canada
Phone: (705) 326-5774
Fax: 705-326-5774
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Lakeland Clinic
2 Albert St North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 878-0933
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. A. DePiero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. DePiero ( CPSO# 71239 )
Dr. S. Surry ( CPSO# 71545 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3C 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
2 Albert Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4J1
Phone Number: (705) 878-0933

Business Address:
169 Front Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 4S8
Phone Number: (705) 286-0188

Business Address:
18 Wyandotte Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5M6
Phone Number: (705) 326-5774

Business Address:
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 329-3649

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ADAIR DEPIERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEPIERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2000