Dempsey, Gerald Paul (CPSO#: 55892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-50 Absolute Avenue
Mississauga ON  L4Z 0B9
Phone: (613) 848-9550
Fax: 888-489-6462
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents can contact Docudavit Solutions: 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 or www.docudavit.com or Phone: 416-781-9083/ 1-888-781-9083 Fax:1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 04 Oct 2018


Address: Fax: 1-888-489-6462
Instructions: Patients seeking to access their medical records from Dr. Dempsey may fax their request
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD PAUL DEMPSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMPSEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1996

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Dempsey’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Dempsey engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by failing to take appropriate steps regarding his office closure, including but not limited to: failure to notify patients of office closure; failure to respond to requests for patient records and/or to provide patient records in a timely manner; and failure to respond to correspondence from the College in a timely manner.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 May 2007
Summary:

 On May 10, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Dempsey to have committed acts of professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee ordered Dr. Dempsey to be 
 reprimanded.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 2007