Des Rosiers, Janie Monique (CPSO#: 89076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janie Des Rosiers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Des Rosiers ( CPSO# 89076 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANIE MONIQUE DES ROSIERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DES ROSIERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014