Dewart, Lauren Elizabeth (CPSO#: 89100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 -740 Hillside Ave
Victoria BC  V8T 1Z4
Phone: 250 595 1551
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dewart Vethanayagam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ELIZABETH DEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 11 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2011 to 11 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 27 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014