Dhalla, Mohsin Nisarhusein (CPSO#: 82017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
410 Highway #8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G2
Phone: (905) 667-3939
Fax: (905) 662-6553
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit A5
1575 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3E2
Canada
Phone: (905) 578-5776
Fax: (905) 578-5779
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Dhalla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dhalla ( CPSO# 82017 )

Business Address:
410 Highway 8
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1G2
Phone Number: (905) 667-3939

Business Address:
Suite A5
1575 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3E2
Phone Number: (905) 578-5776

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHSIN NISARHUSEIN DHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2007