Dhillon, Gagandeep Singh (CPSO#: 84648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gagandeep S. Dhillon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dhillon ( CPSO# 84648 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2398

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAGANDEEP SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011