Dhir, Shalini (CPSO#: 81737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SJHC, Department of Anesthesia
& Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000
Fax: (519) 646-6116
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LHSC
Department of Anesthesia &
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road, P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Victorla Hospital, LHSC
800 Commissioner Road East
London ON  N6C 2V5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8141
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017


Corporation Name: Dhir & Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dhir ( CPSO# 81737 )
Dr. A. Dhir ( CPSO# 78676 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
P.O. Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3022

Business Address:
SJHC
Department of Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Shalini Dhir may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia  and  Perioperative  Medicine,  University  of  Western
                        Ontario,  in  which  Dr.  Dhir holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when  Dr. Dhir no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.