Dillenburg, Rejane Frota (CPSO#: 74250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Rio Grande Sul, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
H S C 3A37
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75242
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Dillenburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dillenburg ( CPSO# 74250 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Suite 3A37
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 11 Jul 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jul 2002 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 May 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Rejane Frota Dillenburg may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department  of  Paediatrics,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.
                        Dillenburg holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in  the Divison of Cardiology at the Hospital for Sick Children  in
                        Toronto, and
                  
                  (iii) to the  extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
                        her appointment.
                  
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  will  automatically  expire  when  Dr.
                  Dillenburg no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.