Divakara Menon, Syamkumar Madathattu (CPSO#: 83399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Calicut University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
HGH Box 340, M-513
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44760
Fax: (905) 577-1447
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Divakara Menon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Divakara Menon ( CPSO# 83399 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital McMaster Clinic
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 12 Jan 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 21 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Syamkumar Madathattu Divakara Menon may practise medicine independently in
            cardiology.