Djuricic, Milla (CPSO#: 86131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Nis, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jeanne d' Arc Medical Centre
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone: (613) 903-7563
Fax: (613) 903-7564
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milla Djuricic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Djuricic ( CPSO# 86131 )

Business Address:
Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone Number: (613) 903-7563

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILLA DJURICIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DJURICIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 May 2007 to 01 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008