Doan, Annie Mai Thu (CPSO#: 95697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annie Doan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Doan ( CPSO# 95697 )

Business Address:
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE MAI THU DOAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2014