Dobbs, Ryan Craig (CPSO#: 91159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519 464 4400
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

239 George Street
Suite B
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P1
Canada
Phone: 519 491 2244
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dobbs and Nyholt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dobbs ( CPSO# 91159 )
Dr. N. Nyholt ( CPSO# 88366 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
239 George Street
Suite B
Sarnia ON  N7T 4P1
Phone Number: (519) 491-2244

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN CRAIG DOBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOBBS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011