Doell, Donald Matthew (CPSO#: 94546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: Doell, Donald (used until: 16 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
GAIN Geriatric Clinic
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4832
Fax: (905) 743-5311
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donald M. Doell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Doell ( CPSO# 94546 )

Business Address:
GAIN Geriatric Assessment Centre
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD MATTHEW DOELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011