Donovan, Kelly Anne (CPSO#: 86229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Whately, Kelly Anne (used until: 10 Feb 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Speedvale Ave E
Guelph ON  N1H 1J2
Phone: 5198371848
Fax: 5198372363
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kelly Donovan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Donovan ( CPSO# 86229 )

Business Address:
11 Speedvale Avenue East
Guelph ON  N1H 1J2
Phone Number: (519) 837-1848

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ANNE DONOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Nov 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2009