Doucet, Katie Margaret (CPSO#: 90737)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: Giles, Katie Margaret (used until: 13 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
402 - 327 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: (705) 775-3379
Fax: (705) 775-5927
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katie M. Doucet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Doucet ( CPSO# 90737 )

Business Address:
Kawartha Cardiology Clinic
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 775-0320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Jan 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATIE MARGARET DOUCET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014