Dragomir, Camelia Cornelia (CPSO#: 74828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone: (416) 534-5127
Fax: (416) 534-1711
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Park Medical Centre
Unit D 2
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 244-4377
Fax: (416) 244-1004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMELIA CORNELIA DRAGOMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAGOMIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002