Dudebout, Jill Jacqueline (CPSO#: 85945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Center of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8201
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. A. Thakrar and J. Dudebout Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Thakrar ( CPSO# 85955 )
Dr. J. Dudebout ( CPSO# 85945 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Cancer Centre Of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
PO Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 658-4544

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL JACQUELINE DUDEBOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDEBOUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 19 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011