Duque-Rendon, Hector Alonso (CPSO#: 77084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Antioquia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 325
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone: (519) 364-0910
Fax: (519) 364-0920
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hector Duque-Rendon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Duque-Rendon ( CPSO# 77084 )

Business Address:
325 - 90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-0910

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HECTOR ALONSO DUQUE-RENDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUQUE-RENDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Dec 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2008