Dvali, Linda Tina Louise (CPSO#: 70020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (647) 346-0154
Fax: (647) 346-7342
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Dvali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dvali ( CPSO# 70020 )

Business Address:
Division of Plastic Surgery
U H N - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 403
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (647) 346-0154

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA TINA LOUISE DVALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003