Eason, Bradley Dana (CPSO#: 85346)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732 2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradley Eason Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Eason ( CPSO# 85346 )

Business Address:
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY DANA EASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2009