Eckhaus, Allan Alfred (CPSO#: 74714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 619-9600
Fax: (905) 619-9617
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1131A Leslie Street
Unit 300
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Canada
Phone: (416) 360-7360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eckhaus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Eckhaus ( CPSO# 74714 )

Business Address:
307 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 619-9600

Business Address:
300 - 1131A Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN ALFRED ECKHAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ECKHAUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007